Jim Ball Pontiac-Buick-GMC, Inc. v. DHL Express (USA), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jim Ball Pontiac-Buick-GMC, Inc.
Defendant: DHL Express (USA), Inc., DHL Worldwide Express, Inc. and DHL Holdings (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00761
Filed: October 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: John T. Curtin
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiff has no cause of action against Defendants as alleged in the Amended Complaint; the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly, and close the file.-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/26/2015. (SDW)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 DECISION AND ORDER granting Defendant's 90 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 9/6/2012. (JEC)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 DECISION AND ORDER denying 78 Renewed Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 1/25/2012. (JEC)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DECISION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 53 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties are directed to contact the court when discovery is complete to establish a further schedule. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 4/7/2011. (JEC)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DECISION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 2/28/2011. (JEC)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECISION AND ORDER denying [19, 20] Motions for Summary Judgment. This case is hereby referred to Mediation. Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 5/24/2010, First Mediation Session due by 7/19/2010, Mediation To conclude by 1/10/2011. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 5/5/2010. (JEC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jim Ball Pontiac-Buick-GMC, Inc. v. DHL Express (USA), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Ball Pontiac-Buick-GMC, Inc.
Represented By: Richard I. Werder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL Express (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL Worldwide Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL Holdings (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?