November 4, 2011 |
Filing
158
ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER denying 122 Motion for DiscoverySo Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 11/4/2011. (DRH)
|
September 23, 2011 |
Filing
151
ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER denying 135 Motion for Reconsideration re 135 MOTION for Reconsideration re 128 Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, Set Deadlines filed by Antonio Brown So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 9/23/2011. (DRH)
|
July 12, 2011 |
Filing
131
ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER denying 130 Motion for Reconsideration re 128 Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, Set DeadlinesSo Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 7/12/2011. (DRH)
|
July 6, 2011 |
Filing
129
ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER denying 116 MotionPlaintiff's third motion for leave to amend the Complaint to add 5 new defendants (Docket No. 116) is denied.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 7/6/2011. (DRH)
|
June 24, 2011 |
Filing
128
ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re MOTION for Protective Order and/or modification of Order filed at Docket No. 96 with cert of service filed by Hodge, Schuessler, B. Fischer, Marinaccio, Swa ck, Pritchard, J. Conway, 122 MOTION for Discovery filed by Antonio Brown, 106 Defendants' motion for protective Order (Docket No. 106) is granted as discussed in this Order; defendants to respond to interrogatories posed in this Order by 7/21/2011.Regarding plaintiff's motion to compel (Docket No. 122, Responses due by 7/14/2011, Replies due by 7/25/2011, motion deemed submitted (without oral argument) by 7/25/2011.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 6/24/2011. (DRH)
|
May 13, 2011 |
Filing
117
ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 116 MOTION re 108 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, 106 MOTION for Protective Order and/or modification of Order filed at Docket No. 96 with cert of s ervice filed by Antonio Brown, 108 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Antonio Brown, 106 MOTION for Protective Order and/or modification of Order filed at Docket No. 96 with cert of service filed by Hodge, Schuessler, B. F ischer, Marinaccio, Swack, Pritchard, J. ConwayPlaintiff's motion for leave to amend the Complaint (Docket No. 108) is granted; plaintiff is to file Second Amended Complaint including allegations against Khahifa by 6/8/20 11. Once filed, the Clerk of Court is instructed to have the U.S. Marshal serve the Second Amended Complaint upon the new defendant. Motions terminated: 108 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Antonio Brown.As for plaintiff's m otion for leave to amend the Complaint to add five new defendants (Docket No. 116), Responses due by 6/8/2011, Replies due by 6/23/2011, and motion deemed submitted (without oral argument) on 6/23/2011.As for defense pending motion for a Protective Order (Docket No. 106), any reply remains due by 5/25/2011 (see Docket No. 115) and that motion will be deemed submitted (without oral argument) on 5/25/2011.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 5/13/2011. (DRH)
|
February 8, 2011 |
Filing
96
ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 89 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Antonio BrownPlaintiff's motion to extend Scheduling Order is granted. Discovery completed by 3/4/2011. Motions terminated: 89 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Antonio Brown.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 2/8/2011. (DRH)
|
August 6, 2010 |
Filing
67
ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to CompelAs stated in the Order, plaintiff's motion to compel is denied in part, granted in part, or deemed moot by defendants' production. Defendants to furnish ordered discovery or privilege log by 8/13/2010.Briefing schedule for defendants' pending motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 51) is amended (Order at 7).So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 8/6/2010. (DRH)
|