United States of America v. Erie County, New York et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Erie County, New York, Chris Collins, Anthony Billittier, Timothy B. Howard, Richard T. Donovan, Robert Koch, Barbara Leary and Donald Livingston
Case Number: 1:2009cv00849
Filed: September 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: William M. Skretny
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part NYCLU's 244 Motion to Intervene and Unseal Records; DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to terminate NYLCU from the case. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 8/30/2013. (MEAL)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER ENTERING STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The 225 Joint Motion for Entry of the Stipulated Order of Dismissal is GRANTED and the [225-1] Stipulated Order of Dismissal is APPROVED, ORDERED and ENTERED. FURTHER, this Court shall retain jurisdict ion over this matter until the terms are fulfilled and retains the power to enforce the Stipulated Order of Dismissal. FURTHER, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 8/25/2011. (CMD)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 125 Motion to Expedite; SETTING a response date of 11/8/2010, 5:00 p.m.; SETTING a reply date of 11/9/2010, noon. SCHEDULING a Status Conference for 11/10/2010 at 10:30 AM before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/5/2010. (MEAL)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Defendants' 13 Motion to Dismiss; DIRECTING the Justice Department to file an amended complaint within 14 days of the filing date of this Decision and Order; DIRECTING the Defendants to file answers to or otherwise move against the amended complaint within 14 days of its filing. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/9/2010. (MEAL)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT CONCERNING SUICIDE PREVENTION AND RELATED MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/22/2010. (MEAL)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Defendants' 56 Motion to Stay. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/19/2010. (MEAL)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING the parties' 45 49 Motions to Expedite; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part the Justice Department's 43 Motion to Compel; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part the Defendants' 46 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/17/2010. (MEAL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Erie County, New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie County, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Billittier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy B. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard T. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?