Walter S. Johnson Building Company, Inc. v. Baggage or Container Automation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Walter S. Johnson Building Company, Inc.
Defendant: Baggage or Container Automation, Inc., Lawrence Majewski and Shannon Majewski
Case Number: 1:2009cv01083
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Niagara
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Arcara
Presiding Judge: H. Kenneth Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECISION AND ORDER granting 18 Motion to Strike, directing Clerk of Court to enter default judgment. Clerk of Court to close case. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 10/21/2011. (JMB)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 11 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 3/29/2010. (KER)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 3/2/2010. (KER)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walter S. Johnson Building Company, Inc. v. Baggage or Container Automation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter S. Johnson Building Company, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Ritter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baggage or Container Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Majewski
Represented By: Richard A. Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Majewski
Represented By: Richard A. Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?