Sioleski v. Fischer et al
Plaintiff: Robert R. Sioleski
Defendant: Brian Fischer, Department of Corrections, Albany, G. McGrain and Magnetron
Case Number: 1:2010cv00665
Filed: August 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Chemung
Presiding Judge: William M. Skretny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration with prejudice. (Copy of this Order sent by first class mail to the Plaintiff.) Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 8/24/15. (JMC)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Defendant McGrain's 18 Motion to Dismiss.Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/4/2012. (Clerk to follow up.) (MEAL)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 21 24 Motions for Appointment of Counsel, without prejudice. FURTHER, Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's 18 Motion to Dismiss by 7/24/2012. Defendants' reply is due by 7/31/2012. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/5/2012. (CMD)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECISION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's 12 Third Amended Complaint is construed as both a Motion for Leave to File and Serve a Third Amended Complaint and/or Supplemental Complaint and a Third Amended and/or Supplemental Complaint and the Motion i s GRANTED; FURTHER, Plaintiff's 11 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED without prejudice; FURTHER, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to amend the caption as specified; FURTHER, that the operative pleading in this action is the Second Amen ded Complaint, First Claim only (Docket No. 5, § 5A, at 4-5) and the Third Amended Complaint, First Claim, Second Claim and "New Amended Complaint" (Docket No. 12); FURTHER, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to cause the United States Mars hals Service to serve the Summons and Second and Third Amended Complaints (Docket Nos. 5 and 12), along with this Decision and Order and prior Decision and Orders (Docket Nos. 4 and 10) upon the Defendants as specified, and FURTHER, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to forward this Decision and Order by First Class Mail to Assistant Attorney General in Charge, Buffalo Regional Office. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/25/2012. (CMD)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the claims against C.O. Hall and C.O. Bennett are dismissed with prejudice. Further Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendants C.O. Hall, C.O. Bennett and Lt. Magnetron as parties to this action. Further, the Clerk of Court is dir ected to cause the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the summons, second amended complaint, and this Order upon C.O. McGrain without Plaintiff's payment therefor, unpaid fees to be recoverable if this action terminates by monetary award in plainti ff's favor. Further, the N.Y. State Attorney General's Office is hereby requested to ascertain the identity of Lieutenant (?) and provide an address at which to serve him by 2/5/12. Once this information is provided, Plaintiff's seco nd amended complaint shall be deemed amended to reflect the full name of the Defendant, a summons shall be issued and this Court shall direct service on Defendant. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of the second amended complaint and this Decision and Order to the Assistant Attorney General (Buffalo). Further, defendant McGrain is directed to respond to the second amended complaint. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 1/4/12. (DZ)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 7 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/2/2011. (CMD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sioleski v. Fischer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R. Sioleski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections, Albany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. McGrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnetron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?