NRP Holdings LLC et al v. City of Buffalo et al
Plaintiff: NRP Holdings LLC and NRP Properties LLC
Defendant: City of Buffalo, Bryon W. Brown, Demone A. Smith, Richard A. Stenhouse, Buffalo Jeremiah Partnership for Community Development, Inc., JOHN DOE 1 - 10 and JOHN DOE COMPANIES 1 - 5
Case Number: 1:2011cv00472
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: William M. Skretny
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' 209 Motion for Review of the Clerk's Order Taxing Costs; DIRECTING that Plaintiffs be taxed in accordance with the Clerk's 208 Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 9/29/2017. (MEAL)- CLERK TO FOLLOW UP -
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Defendants the City of Buffalo, Byron W. Brown, and Demone A. Smith's 152 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING the City of Buffalo Urban Renewal Agency's 165 Motion for Summary Judgment; DISMISSING the cla ims against Steven M. Casey; DENYING Plaintiffs NRP Holdings LLC and NRP Properties LLC's 177 Motion for Additional Discovery; DENYING Plaintiffs NRP Holdings LLC and NRP Properties LLC's 194 Motion for Leave to file a Sur-reply; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to close this case. Signed by the Hon. William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 2/27/2017. (MEAL)- CLERK TO FOLLOW UP -
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' 154 Motion to Strike; SETTING a submission schedule on the pending 152 166 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 11/17/2016. (MEAL)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 DECISION AND ORDER granting 161 Motion to Stay Further Discovery. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/15/2016. (SDW)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part NRP's 125 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-reply; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants' 112 116 Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 12/17/2015. (MEAL)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendant BURA's 58 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 9/14/2013. (MEAL)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING the City of Buffalo Defendants' and Demone Smith's 26 27 Motions to Dismiss with respect to NRP's first, third, and fifth causes of action and DENYING it with respect to NRP's second and fourth caus es of action; GRANTING NRP's 37 Motion for Leave to Amend its Amended Complaint and Join BURA; DENYING as moot NRP's 37 Motion to Strike the Connors Reply Declaration; DIRECTING NRP to file its Second Amended Complaint seven days from the date of this Decision and Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/12/2012. (MEAL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NRP Holdings LLC et al v. City of Buffalo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NRP Holdings LLC
Represented By: Thomas S. Lane
Represented By: Nelson Perel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NRP Properties LLC
Represented By: Thomas S. Lane
Represented By: Nelson Perel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Buffalo
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: James W. Grable, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryon W. Brown
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: James W. Grable, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demone A. Smith
Represented By: Timothy Alfred Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Stenhouse
Represented By: Daniel C. Oliverio
Represented By: John Leonard Sinatra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Jeremiah Partnership for Community Development, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Oliverio
Represented By: John Leonard Sinatra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE COMPANIES 1 - 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?