Polk v. Olles et al
Plaintiff: |
Quinndale Polk |
Defendant: |
Anthony J. Olles, Sean P. White and Richard E. Simmons |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv01106 |
Filed: |
November 9, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of New York |
Office: |
Buffalo Office |
County: |
Wyoming |
Presiding Judge: |
Leslie G. Foschio |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 29, 2016 |
Filing
43
DECISION AND ORDER ACCEPTING the December 29, 2015 38 Report and Recommendation; DENYING Plaintiff's 39 objections; GRANTING Defendants' 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; DISMISSING the Complaint; DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to close this case. Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 2/29/2016. (MEAL) - CLERK TO FOLLOW UP -
|
June 16, 2014 |
Filing
27
ORDER granting 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Appointed Parker Roy MacKay for Quinndale Polk. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/16/2014. -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-(SDW)
|
May 22, 2013 |
Filing
7
ORDER that plaintiff is granted leave to file a second amended complaint as directed by 6/25/13. Further, the Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff with this Order, a copy of the amended complaint (docket no. 6), a blank section 1983 complain t form and the instructions for preparing an amended complaint. Further if plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint by 6/25/13, the amended complaint will be dismissed with prejudice without further order of the Court and leave to appeal as a poor person denied. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 5/22/13. (DZ)
|
January 22, 2013 |
Filing
5
ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 4 Motion to Amend or Correct; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint as directed by 2/20/13. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff with this Order, a copy of the complaint, a blank section 1983 complaint form and the instructions for preparing an amended complaint. In the event the complaint is dismissed because plaintiff has failed to fie an amended complaint by said date, the Court certifies that leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals as a poor person is denied. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 1/18/13. (DZ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?