Cooper v. New York State Dept. of Corrections and Community Supervision et al
Plaintiff: Jason D. Cooper
Defendant: New York State Dept. of Corrections and Community Supervision, Brian Fischer, Michael Sheahan, Maltese, T. Hill and Other Unknown Officers
Case Number: 1:2012cv01227
Filed: December 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Genesee
Presiding Judge: Hugh B. Scott
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE: 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by C. Haff, Michael Sheahan, Travis Hill, Shawn VanHorn, Michael Maltese.Objections due per 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 6, 72.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 4/8/2020. (GAI)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion to Amend or Correct. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 11/12/2018. (GAI)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DECISION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 68 Motion to Amend or Correct.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 6/5/2018. (GAI)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Quash.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 12/20/2016. (GAI)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECISION AND ORDER ASSIGNING William Chen, Esq. pro bono to represent the Plaintiff in this case. FURTHER, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to forward a copy of this Order, the Docket Sheet and the Guidelines Governing Reimbursement from the District Court Fund of Expenses to court appointed counsel. FURTHER, a Status Conference is scheduled to be held on 3/4/2015 at 9:00 AM before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/27/2015. (CMD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. New York State Dept. of Corrections and Community Supervision et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason D. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Dept. of Corrections and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sheahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maltese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?