Brown v. Chappius et al
Plaintiff: Carl Brown
Defendant: Paul Chappius, Jr., Craig Diego, Stephen Wenderlich, Paul Youmans, Jamey Morris, Jeremy Taylor, Daniel Staight and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2013cv00105
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Cayuga
Presiding Judge: Leslie G. Foschio
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 DECISION AND ORDER granting 96 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 117 Motion ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 139 Report and Recommendations.; finding as moot 167 Motion ; finding as moot 168 Motion ; finding as moot 169 Motion to Compel. (Clerk to close case.) (Copy of this Decision and Order sent by first class mail to Plaintiff Carl Brown.) Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 5/20/19. (JMC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief (Doc. No. 20) is DISMISSED as moot; Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. No. 88), is DENIED; and Plaintiff's motion to compel (Doc. No. 88) is DISMISSED as moot in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/10/2015. (SDW) (Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff.)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Joinder; denying 37 Motion to Compel; denying 38 Motion to Amend or Correct; denying 38 Motion to Compel; denying 39 Motion to Compel; denying 40 Motion to Compel; denying 41 Motion to Compel; denying 47 Motion for Discovery; denying 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 50 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/6/2014. (SDW)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/23/2013. (SDW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Chappius et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Chappius, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Wenderlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Youmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamey Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Staight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?