DiFrancesco et al v. Win-Sum Ski Corp et al
Plaintiff: Bryan DiFrancesco
Defendant: Win-Sum Ski Corp and Holiday Valley, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00148
Filed: February 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: William M. Skretny
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 71 Text Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Hearings, 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Bryan DiFrancesco, 84 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion filed by Holiday Valley, Inc., Win-Sum Ski Corp, 88 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bryan DiFrancescoAMENDED PRETRIAL ORDERThe substantive portion of defendants� 39; Motion to Compel (Docket No. 84) is denied as moot; plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order (Docket No. 88) is also denied as moot. Defendants' Motion (Docket No. 84) for discovery sanctions is held in abeyance pending resolution of tr ial. Plaintiffs' Motion (Docket No. 86) to extend discovery is granted. As a result, Discovery now completed by 8/15/2017, Pretrial Order and trial submissions and motions in limine (as discussed in this Order) due by 9/15/2017. Final Pre trial Conference set for Wed., 9/20/2017, 10:45 AM, before Hon. Hugh B. Scott. Jury Selection set for Tues., 10/10/2017, 10:00 AM, before Hon. Hugh B. Scott, with Jury Trial set to commence for 10/10/2017, 10:00 AM, following complet ion of jury selection before Hon. Hugh B. Scott.Motions terminated: 88 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bryan DiFrancesco, 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Bryan DiFrancesco, 84 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion filed by Holiday Valley, Inc., Win-Sum Ski Corp.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 5/16/2017. (DRH)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Bryan DiFrancesco, 70 Order on Motion to QuashPlaintiffs' Moti on for Extension of Time (Docket No. 77) is granted in part, denied in part; plaintiffs have until 5/2/2017 to complete discovery; Discovery completed by 5/2/2017.Supplemental Final Pretrial Order:Motions in Limine, supp lemental pretrial submissions, Exhibit List due by 6/5/2017, Expert Witness List due by 6/5/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for Wed., 7/12/2017, 10:15 AM, before Hon. Hugh B. Scott.Jury Selection remain set for Mon., 7/17/2017, 9:30 AM, before Hon. Hugh B. Scott, with Jury Trial set to commence at completion of jury selection.Defendants' request for production by subpoena from Holimont (Docket No. 70, Order; see Docket No. 43, Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoena) is denied; Chambers to return papers produced for in camera inspection to Holimont.Motions terminated: 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Bryan DiFrancesco.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 4/20/2017. (DRH)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER granting 75 Motion to CompelParties are to schedule continued deposition of plaintiff Bryan DiFrancesco and report status on 4/19/2017.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 4/7/2017. (DRH)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion in LimineAs detailed in this Order.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 3/20/2017. (DRH)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' motion for a protective Order (Docket No. 43) is denied, their Motion to qu ash two subpoenas is denied in part.Plaintiffs are to produce for in camera inspection 2015 medical records as specified in the Order.Supplemental discovery concludes by 4/5/2017.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 2/22/2017. (DRH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiFrancesco et al v. Win-Sum Ski Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan DiFrancesco
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Win-Sum Ski Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Valley, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?