McQueen v. Huddleston and Huddleston

Plaintiff: Donald McQueen
Defendant: Huddleston and Huddleston
Case Number: 1:2013cv00302
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: New York Western District Court
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Albany
Presiding Judge: John T. Curtin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 34 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file and serve Second Amended Complaint within 14 days of the date of entry of this Order. Plaintiff's 37 Motion for a Protective Order is also gran ted, and Plaintiff need not produce a copy of the audio recording of the 3/27/2012 voice message until such time as the parties shall agree is mutually appropriate. Plaintiff's request for sanctions is denied, without prejudice. The court' ;s docket shall reflect that the relief sought in Items 26, 30, 34, and 37 have been fully addressed by the court. A Telephone Conference shall be held on 8/5/2015 at 2 p.m. to discuss a schedule for discovery and further proceedings. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 6/9/2015. (JEC)
January 8, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER denying Defendant's 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The parties are directed to exchange initial disclosures within 2 weeks of the entry of this order, and to meet and confer in accordance with Rule 26(f). The court finds that this case is appropriate for immediate referral to mediation. Selection of mediator due 2/9/2015. First Mediation Session due by 4/1/2015. Status Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2015 at 1:15 p.m. before Hon. John T. Curtin. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 1/7/2015. (JEC)
May 1, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP---DECISION AND ORDER denying the portion of Defendant's 13 submission designated as a Motion to Dismiss. The portion of Item 13 designated as an "Answer" shall be considered the operative responsive pleading. A Scheduling Telephone Conference will be held on 7/16/2014 at 1:45 p.m. The parties are directed to comply with the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. 26 prior to the Scheduling Conference. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 4/30/2014. (JEC)
October 10, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 10 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Plaintiff shall file and serve a clean copy of amended complaint within 30 days, and defendant shall respond in accordance with the requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendant's motion to dismiss is denied. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 10/2/2013. (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McQueen v. Huddleston and Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald McQueen
Represented By: Seth Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huddleston and Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?