Evans v. Griffin et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Evans
Defendant: Thomas Griffin, M. Balmer, L. Tillinghast, T. Paluch, F. Fuller, J. Clement, A. Pedalty, Ellis, E. Thatcher, C. Maldano and E. Rozell
Case Number: 1:2013cv00805
Filed: August 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Chemung
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Arcara
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 DECISION AND ORDER denying 127 Motion for Prospective Relief. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 04/20/2017. (CDH) (A copy of this Decision and Order was mailed to pro se plaintiff on 4/20/2017).
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 DECISION AND ORDER granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 03/24/2017. (CDH) (A copy of this Decision and Order was mailed to pro se plaintiff on 3/24/2017). -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 DECISION AND ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge Hugh B. Scott's Report and Recommendation 93 in its entirety, and affirming Judge Scott's Decision and Order in its entirety. Plaintiff's motions for prospective or injunctive relief 86 and 89 are denied. Plaintiff's motion for video footage 90 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 91 is granted, and the other pending motions 73 78 and 80 are denied in their entirety. The matter is referred back to Magistrate Judge Scott for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 11/23/16. (LAS)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE: 89 MOTION Prospective Relief and Supplemental Complaint filed by Shawn Evans, 86 MOTION filed by Shawn Evans (Combined with Decision and Order at Dkt. No. 92). Objections due per 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 9/20/2016. (GAI)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 DECISION AND ORDER affirming Magistrate Judge Hugh B. Scott's Decision and Order 56 . This matter remains with Magistrate Judge Scott for further pretial proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 4/21/16. (LAS)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Compel.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 12/1/2015. (GAI)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge Hugh B. Scott's Report and Recommendation as filed on August 5, 2014. The plaintiff's motion for default judgment is denied. The parties shall comply with the pretrial proceedings dates as established in Judge Scott's Report and Recommendation 14 . The case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Scott for further proceedings. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 9/8/14. (LAS)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the First and Second Amended Complaints are dismissed without prejudice. Further, the Clerk of Court is directed to cause the U.S. Marshals Service to serve the summons and complaint, this Order and the Order filed 12/6/13 (docket no. 4) upon defendants Fuller, Balmer, Tillinghast and Paluch without plaintiff's payment therefor, unpaid fees to be recoverable if this action terminates by monetary award in plaintiff's favor. Further, the Clerk of Court is also directed to forward a copy of this Order by email to Michael Russo, Assistant Attorney General in Charge (Buffalo); defendants are directed to answer the complaint.. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 4/2/14. (DZ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Griffin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Balmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Tillinghast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Paluch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Pedalty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Thatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Maldano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Rozell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?