Williams v. Swack et al
Plaintiff: George Williams
Defendant: Keith Swack, Sean Warner, Matthew Raddemacher and Eric Hibsch
Case Number: 1:2013cv00974
Filed: September 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah J. McCarthy
Presiding Judge: William M. Skretny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 DECISION AND ORDER: the remaining portions of plaintiff's motion to compel 80 are denied with the exception of plaintiff's request for an award of attorney's fees. I will defer consideration of the amount of attorney's fees to be awarded pending an application by plaintiff at the conclusion of the case. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 9/6/2016. (JDK)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DECISION AND ORDER Re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 30 . Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 6/29/16. (DAZ)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DECISION AND ORDER denying 57 Motion to Continue; denying 58 Motion for Joinder; denying 59 Motion to Continue. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 5/12/15. (DAZ)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court adopts Magistrate Judge Azrack's R&R as the opinion of the Court. Defendants' motion to transfer venue is granted, and the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 9/24/2013. [Transferred from nyed on 9/26/2013.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Swack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Williams
Represented By: Glenn D. Miller
Represented By: Edward Sivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Swack
Represented By: Joel L. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Warner
Represented By: Cheryl Meyers Buth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Raddemacher
Represented By: Norman P. Effman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Hibsch
Represented By: Joseph M. LaTona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?