Rosehoff, Ltd. v. Truscott Terrace Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rosehoff, Ltd.
Defendant: Truscott Terrace Holdings LLC, Truscott Terrace Holdings Group LLC, Truscott Terrace International Holdings Group LLC, Gregory Gannon and Gordon Gannon
Case Number: 1:2014cv00277
Filed: April 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: William M. Skretny
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DECISION AND ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Rosehoff's Motion for Summary Judgment as to its second cause of action (Docket No. 55) is GRANTED.FURTHER, that this Court declares that Defendants do not have trade dress rig hts in the plastic bottle depicted in Attachment 1.FURTHER, that Rosehoff's fifth cause of action is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction.FURTHER, that Rosehoff's first, third, fourth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth and tenth causes of a ction are DISMISSED as MOOT.FURTHER, that Rosehoff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. 83) is DENIED AS MOOT.FURTHER, that the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case.SO ORDERED.Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 3/27/2020. (JCM)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 DECISION AND ORDER dismissing 73 Motion ; granting 76 Motion to Compel. Defendants shall tender a replacement check in the amount of $8,298.02 payable to Plaintiff's counsel Barclay Damon, attention: Charles von Simson, Esq. or by del ivery of cash or cash equivalent in the same amount, within 14 days of this Decision and Order. Failure to do so may result in further proceedings including a certification of the matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 626(e)(6)(B)(iii). Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/23/2017. (SDW)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's request for expenses including reasonable attorneys fees incurred in connection with Plaintiff's motions to compel is GRANTED. Plaintiff's affidavit of such expenses shall be filed within 30 days; Defendants' response shall be filed within 15 days thereafter. Oral argument shall be at the court's discretion.Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/10/2016. (SDW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosehoff, Ltd. v. Truscott Terrace Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosehoff, Ltd.
Represented By: Charles B. von Simson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truscott Terrace Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truscott Terrace Holdings Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truscott Terrace International Holdings Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?