Bounkhoun v. Barnes et al
Plaintiff: Chandy Bounkhoun
Defendant: Steven E. Barnes, Esq., Ross M. Cellino, Esq., Christopher D. D'Amato, Esq. and Cellino & Barnes, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00631
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Arcara
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Disclosure; granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Quash. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 3/30/2020. (GAI)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECISION AND ORDER finding as moot (without prejudice) 45 Motion to Quash; finding as moot (without prejudice) 47 Motion to Quash. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 8/20/2019. (GAI)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECISION AND ORDER finding as moot 35 Motion for Disclosure.Joint written status report due 6/28/2019.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 5/7/2019. (GAI)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Decision and Order, the Defendants' motion to dismiss 10 is denied, and the Defendants' sanctions motion 11 is granted in part. The Court adopts the R&R's recommendation to impose Rule 11 sanctions, but as discussed above, the Court sanctions Plaintiff's counsel $500, and only for the inclusion of a civil conspiracy claim in the Plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff's counsel shall pay $500, by c heck or money order made payable to Clerk of Court, within 30 days of the date of this Decision and Order. This case is recommitted to Judge Scott for further proceedings. To ensure that this case moves forward expeditiously, any further dispositive motions shall be made returnable before the undersigned. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 4/17/2018. (LAS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bounkhoun v. Barnes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Barnes, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross M. Cellino, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. D'Amato, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellino & Barnes, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandy Bounkhoun
Represented By: Patrick J. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?