Perkins, et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Fredrick Perkins and Alice J Perkins
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2016cv00495
Filed: June 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Cattaraugus
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE: 70 MOTION to Strike Summary Judgment Evidence filed by United States of America; 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fredrick Perkins, Alice J Perkins; and 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America.Objections due per 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 6, 72. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 7/24/2018. (GAI)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DECISION AND ORDER denying 43 Motion to Stay. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 4/18/2018. (GAI)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DECISION AND ORDER denying 32 Motion to Stay; granting 33 Motion to Opt Out of ADR. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 11/9/2017. (GAI)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECISION AND ORDER adopting in part and denying in part Judge Scott's 14 Report and Recommendation. FURTHER, the Court denies the government's 9 Motion to Dismiss, as specified. FURTHER, this matter is referred back to Judge Scott consistent with the Order of Referral already in place. See Docket Item 10. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/4/2017. (CMD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins, et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Perkins
Represented By: Gary D. Borek
Represented By: Margaret A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice J Perkins
Represented By: Gary D. Borek
Represented By: Margaret A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?