Aikens v. Herbst et al
Plaintiff: |
Anthony Aikens |
Defendant: |
Herbst, Zolads, J. Becker and Thompson |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00772 |
Filed: |
September 26, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of New York |
Office: |
Buffalo Office |
County: |
Wyoming |
Presiding Judge: |
William M. Skretny |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 5, 2017 |
Filing
12
ORDER DISMISSING the 11 Third Amended Complaint with prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), 1915A(b)(1); DIRECTING that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and DENYING leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals as a poor person; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to close this case.Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 6/30/2017. (MEAL) Copy mailed to Plaintiff. -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
|
April 3, 2017 |
Filing
10
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis; DENYING Plaintiff's 8 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order; GRANTING Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint only as directed by May 15, 2017; DISMISSING the Second Amended Complaint with prejudice if Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint as directed; DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to close this case as dismissed with prejudice without further order in the event the Second Amended Complaint i s dismissed because Plaintiff has failed to amend; WARNING Plaintiff that in the event the Second Amended Complaint is dismissed because Plaintiff has failed to amend, the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from t his Order would not be taken in good faith, and leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals as a poor person is denied. Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 4/3/2017. (MEAL) Copy mailed to Plaintiff. - CLERK TO FOLLOW UP -
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?