Jackson et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Bobbi Jackson and Matthew Jackson
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00787
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Chautauqua
Presiding Judge: Frank P. Geraci
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 DECISION AND ORDER denying 77 Motion to Certify Class; denying 87 Motion to Strike. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/30/19. (BJJ)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DECISION AND ORDER upholding Magistrate Judge Scott's denial of Plaintiffs' 30 Motion to Amend and denying Plaintiffs' alternative request for jurisdictional discovery. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/25/18. (KAJ)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Compel.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 7/12/2018. (GAI) (Main Document 56 replaced on 7/12/2018) (GAI). (Modified on 7/12/2018 to correct main document only to reflect on page 1 that current scheduling order is Dkt. No. 55) (GAI).
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DECISION AND ORDER denying 30 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 5/25/2018. (GAI)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 11/21/2017. (KAJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi Jackson
Represented By: Geoffrey G. Bestor
Represented By: Lorenzo Belmondo Cellini
Represented By: Catherine Creighton
Represented By: Jonathan K. Tycko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Jackson
Represented By: Geoffrey G. Bestor
Represented By: Lorenzo Belmondo Cellini
Represented By: Catherine Creighton
Represented By: Jonathan K. Tycko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?