Trankle v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Trankle and Jamie Arthur Trankle
Defendant: Colvin and Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 1:2016cv00846
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER resolving #14 Motion for Attorney Fees. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/21/2018. (AFM)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER: On 3/5/2018, Plaintiff filed #14 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Commissioner may respond by 3/26/2018 and Plaintiff may file a reply by 4/2/2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/6/2018. (AFM)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Jamie Arthur Trankle. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affirmation of Brandi Smith, #3 Exhibit Fee Agreement with Assignment)(Smith, Brandi)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT in favor of Jamie Arthur Trankle against Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/5/2017. (KM)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECISION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #9 is GRANTED and the Commissioner's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #10 is DENIED. The Commissioner's decision is REVERSED and this matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner solely for calculation and payment of benefits. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/3/2017. (AFM)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and in Response to Plaintiff's Brief Pursuant to Local Standing Order on Social Security Cases filed by Jamie Arthur Trankle. (Smith, Brandi)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and in Response to Plaintiff's Brief Pursuant to Local Standing Order on Social Security Cases by Carolyn W. Colvin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Aden, Sergei)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Jamie Arthur Trankle. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Smith, Brandi)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandi Christine Smith on behalf of Jamie Arthur Trankle (Smith, Brandi)
January 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT (Social Security) . (Aden, Sergei)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sergei Aden on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin (Aden, Sergei)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jamie Arthur Trankle (Hiller, Kenneth)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carolyn W. Colvin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 summons issued, #2 summons issued)(KM)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service of papers, which may be done by certified mail, shall be performed by Plaintiff's attorney. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/26/2016. (KM)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. (KM)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamie Arthur Trankle.(Hiller, Kenneth)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin, filed by Jamie Arthur Trankle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hiller, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trankle v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Sergei Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trankle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Arthur Trankle
Represented By: Brandi Christine Smith
Represented By: Kenneth R. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?