Sit N' Stay Pet Services, Inc. v. Hoffman
Plaintiff: Sit N' Stay Pet Services, Inc.
Defendant: Carrie Hoffman
Case Number: 1:2017cv00116
Filed: February 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah J. McCarthy
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DECISION AND ORDER adopting 54 report and recommendations re 43 motion for attorney fees and 45 motion for extension of time. The case is referred back to Judge McCarthy to ensure compliance with Section D of the R&R. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 2/20/2019. (LCH)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING plaintiff's motion for sanctions 18 . The case is referred back to Judge McCarthy for further proceedings consistent with the referral order of March 1, 2017. Docket Item 7 . SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/27/2017. (CMD)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECISION AND ORDER ADOPTING 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, this Court denies defendant's 6 motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(1). FURTHER, plaintiff's 18 request for Rule 11 sanctions is denied. FURTHER, this case is referred back to Judge McCarthy for further proceedings consistent with the referral order of March 1, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 9/5/2017. (CMD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sit N' Stay Pet Services, Inc. v. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sit N' Stay Pet Services, Inc.
Represented By: Steven S. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Hoffman
Represented By: Geffrey Gismondi
Represented By: Diane R. Tiveron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?