Korn v. Harrington
Appellant: Marc Irwin Korn
Appellee: William K. Harrington
Case Number: 1:2018cv00873
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Supplemental Transmittal/Designation of Record on Appeal (Attachments: #1 BK Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Transcript, #3 Notice of Transcript, #4 Notice of Transcript) (SG)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. (NRE)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 14-11430/ A.P. No. 14-01113. File received, filed by Marc Irwin Korn. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, A.P. Dkt# 90, #2 Order being Appealed, A.P. Dkt# 85)(NRE) Modified on 8/9/2018 to correct title (NRE). Modified on 8/28/2018 to add case association (NRE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korn v. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Marc Irwin Korn
Represented By: Paul M. Pochepan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William K. Harrington
Represented By: Joseph W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?