Cardenas et al v. A.J. Piedimonte Agricultural Development, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shonda Tate, Jose F Cardenas, Isaiah Alexander, Veronica Simmons Bailey, Kathy Alexander, Juanita Senteno, ARMANDO CARDENAS, Juanito Senteno, Saprina Simmons, Brian White, Monica Santes, Clarence Campbell, April Colson, Robert Scott, Kenneth McNeil, Lynnette Schumacher, Jarred Hodgins, Curtis Siler, Chanel Conner, Dymon Close, Miguel Cardenas, Tanya Conner and Bradley Chadsey
Defendant: Scott James Bennett, MAGC, INC., James J. Piedimonte & Sons, LLC, Anthony Joseph Piedimonte, A.J. Piedimonte Agricultural Development, LLC and James J. Piedimonte & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00881
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Michael J Roemer
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(NRE)
October 4, 2018 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by A.J. Piedimonte Agricultural Development, LLC, Scott James Bennett, James J. Piedimonte & Sons, Inc., James J. Piedimonte & Sons, LLC, MAGC, INC., Anthony Joseph Piedimonte.(Cook, David)
October 1, 2018 Filing 31 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Robert David McCreanor on behalf of Monica Santes. (McCreanor, Robert)
September 21, 2018 Filing 30 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by John Anthony Marsella on behalf of Jarred Hodgins. (Marsella, John)
September 21, 2018 SCHEDULING NOTICE as to #28 MOTION to Certify Class. Responses due by 10/12/2018. Replies due by 10/26/2018. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2018 11:00 AM before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ)
September 20, 2018 Filing 29 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Michael J. Roemer for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 9/20/2018. (NRE)
September 18, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Certify Class by Isaiah Alexander, Kathy Alexander, Clarence Campbell, Armando Cardenas, Jose F Cardenas, Miguel Cardenas, Bradley Chadsey, Dymon Close, April Colson, Chanel Conner, Tanya Conner, Kenneth McNeil, Lynnette Schumacher, Robert Scott, Juanita Senteno, Curtis Siler, Saprina Simmons, Veronica Simmons Bailey, Shonda Tate, Brian White. Responses due by 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix A. Notice of Pendency of Lawsuit, #3 Appendix B. Consent to Sue Form, #4 Appendix C. Text Notice of Pendency of Lawsuit, #5 Declaration of April Colson, #6 Declaration of Armando Cardenas, #7 Declaration of Juanita Senteno)(Marsella, John)
September 18, 2018 Filing 27 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by John Anthony Marsella on behalf of Brian White. (Marsella, John)
September 14, 2018 Filing 26 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by John Anthony Marsella on behalf of Bradley Chadsey. (Marsella, John)
September 14, 2018 Filing 25 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by John Anthony Marsella on behalf of Saprina Simmons. (Marsella, John)
September 7, 2018 Filing 23 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by John Anthony Marsella on behalf of Kenneth McNeil. (Marsella, John)
September 5, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by James J. Piedimonte & Sons, LLC. (Cook, David)
September 5, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by James J. Piedimonte & Sons, Inc.. (Cook, David)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed request for an extension of time to file an answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Answer due date updated as to A.J. Piedimonte Agricultural Development, LLC answer due 10/4/2018; Scott James Bennett answer due 10/4/2018; James J. Piedimonte & Sons, Inc. answer due 10/4/2018; James J. Piedimonte & Sons, LLC answer due 10/4/2018; MAGC, INC. answer due 10/4/2018; Anthony Joseph Piedimonte answer due 10/4/2018. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 9/4/2018. (KLH)
September 4, 2018 Filing 20 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by John Anthony Marsella on behalf of Curtis Siler. (Marsella, John)
September 4, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAGC, INC.. (Cook, David)
September 4, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.J. Piedimonte Agricultural Development, LLC. (Cook, David)
August 31, 2018 Filing 17 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by John Anthony Marsella on behalf of Robert Scott. (Marsella, John)
August 31, 2018 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by John Anthony Marsella on behalf of Miguel Cardenas. (Marsella, John)
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Cook on behalf of A.J. Piedimonte Agricultural Development, LLC, Scott James Bennett, James J. Piedimonte & Sons, Inc., James J. Piedimonte & Sons, LLC, MAGC, INC., Anthony Joseph Piedimonte (Cook, David)
August 29, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by John Anthony Marsella on behalf of Tanya Conner. (Marsella, John)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by John Anthony Marsella on behalf of Clarence Campbell. (Marsella, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by John Anthony Marsella on behalf of Lynnette Schumacher. (Marsella, John)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by John Anthony Marsella on behalf of April Colson. (Marsella, John)
August 20, 2018 E-Filing Notification: regarding #9 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document not legible due to sideways scan. No Action required: Corrected by Clerk's Office (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/20/2018) (NRE). (NRE)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Robert David McCreanor on behalf of Chanel Conner. (McCreanor, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Robert David McCreanor on behalf of Dymon Close. (McCreanor, Robert) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/20/2018) (NRE).
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Scott Bennett on 8/14/18, filed by Isaiah Alexander, Kathy Alexander, Armando Cardenas, Jose F Cardenas, Juanita Senteno, Veronica Simmons Bailey, Shonda Tate. (McCreanor, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Anthony Piedimonte on 8/14/18, filed by Kathy Alexander, Armando Cardenas, Jose F Cardenas, Juanita Senteno, Veronica Simmons Bailey, Shonda Tate. (McCreanor, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on MAGC, Inc. on 8/14/18, filed by Isaiah Alexander, Kathy Alexander, Armando Cardenas, Jose F Cardenas, Juanita Senteno, Veronica Simmons Bailey, Shonda Tate. (McCreanor, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on James J. Piedemonte & Sons LLC on 8/14/18, filed by Isaiah Alexander, Kathy Alexander, Armando Cardenas, Jose F Cardenas, Juanita Senteno, Veronica Simmons Bailey, Shonda Tate. (McCreanor, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on James J. Piedemonte & Sons Inc. on 8/14/18, filed by Isaiah Alexander, Kathy Alexander, Armando Cardenas, Jose F Cardenas, Juanita Senteno, Veronica Simmons Bailey, Shonda Tate. (McCreanor, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on A.J. Piedimonte Agricultural Development, LLC on 8/14/18, filed by Isaiah Alexander, Kathy Alexander, Armando Cardenas, Jose F Cardenas, Juanita Senteno, Veronica Simmons Bailey, Shonda Tate. (McCreanor, Robert)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to A.J. Piedimonte Agricultural Development, LLC, Scott James Bennett, James J. Piedimonte & Sons, Inc., James J. Piedimonte & Sons, LLC, MAGC, INC., Anthony Joseph Piedimonte. (NRE)
August 9, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (NRE)
August 9, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(NRE)
August 9, 2018 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (NRE)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3185628, filed by Kathy Alexander, Jose F Cardenas, ARMANDO CARDENAS, Veronica Simmons Bailey, Isaiah Alexander, Juanita Senteno, Shonda Tate. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff)(Marsella, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardenas et al v. A.J. Piedimonte Agricultural Development, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shonda Tate
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose F Cardenas
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Alexander
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Simmons Bailey
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Alexander
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Senteno
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMANDO CARDENAS
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanito Senteno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saprina Simmons
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian White
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Santes
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Campbell
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Colson
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Scott
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth McNeil
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnette Schumacher
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarred Hodgins
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Siler
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanel Conner
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dymon Close
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Represented By: Robert David McCreanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Cardenas
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Conner
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Chadsey
Represented By: John Anthony Marsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott James Bennett
Represented By: David L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGC, INC.
Represented By: David L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Piedimonte & Sons, LLC
Represented By: David L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Joseph Piedimonte
Represented By: David L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.J. Piedimonte Agricultural Development, LLC
Represented By: David L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Piedimonte & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?