Animal Welfare Institute et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al

Plaintiff: Animal Welfare Institute and Farm Sanctuary
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture and Food Safety and Inspection Service
Case Number: 1:2018cv00937
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Intradistrict Transfer to Rochester Division, case opened in Rochester under case number 18-cv-6626. (SG)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASEIT HEREBY IS ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the Rochester Division of the United States District Court for the Western District of New York.SO ORDERED.Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/29/2018. (CMD)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Food Safety and Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 summons issued, #2 summons issued, #3 summons issued)(SG)
August 24, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
August 24, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
August 24, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3197613, filed by Animal Welfare Institute, Farm Sanctuary. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Supplement Summons, #5 Supplement Summons)(Lawton, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Animal Welfare Institute et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Safety and Inspection Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Welfare Institute
Represented By: William N. Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Sanctuary
Represented By: William N. Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?