Barlow v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Barlow
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., First Franklin Finance Corporation and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00956
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 BRIEF in SUPPORT of Plaintiff's Opposition re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Michael Barlow. (KM)
October 11, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER. With the filing of #11 motion to dismiss by defendants Bank of America and First Franklin Financial Corporation's on 10/5/2018, the Court modifies the briefing schedule issued on 10/1/2018 re: #2 motion to dismiss by Nationstar Mortgage for responses and replies to be filed simultaneously. The new briefing schedule re defendants' #2 #11 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is set as follows: Plaintiff's responses are now due by 10/29/2018. Replies are now due by 11/5/2018. If necessary, the Court will schedule oral argument at later time. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/9/2018. (Chambers mailed a copy of this text order to pro se plaintiff, Michael Barlow). (CMD)
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bank of America, N.A., First Franklin Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Text of Proposed Order, #19 Certificate of Service)(Saydah, Heather)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Franklin Finance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent NB Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch Mortgage Services Corporation, Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC, Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch International Incorporated, Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital, Inc. for First Franklin Finance Corporation.. (Saydah, Heather)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent Bana Holding Corp., Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A... (Saydah, Heather)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Elizabeth Saydah on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., First Franklin Finance Corporation (Saydah, Heather)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Barlow. First Franklin Finance Corporation served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (KM)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Barlow. Bank of America, N.A. served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (KM)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 10/15/2018. Replies due by 10/22/2018. If necessary, the Court will schedule oral argument at later time. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/1/2018. (Chambers mailed a copy of text order to pro se plaintiff, Michael Barlow).(CMD)
October 1, 2018 E-Filing Notification regarding #4 MOTION TO DISMISS. Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use the Memorandum/Brief event found under Other Documents. No action required. (KM)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF #2 MOTION TO DISMISS - filing of Corrected Brief by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Cavanaugh, Kathleen) Modified document title on 10/1/2018 (KM).
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC and Nationstar Sub2 LLC for Nationstar Mortgage LLC.. (Cavanaugh, Kathleen)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Kathleen Cavanaugh, #3 Exhibit A-L, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Cavanaugh, Kathleen)
September 4, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
September 4, 2018 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A., First Franklin Finance Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (KM)(Summons mailed to plaintiff)
September 4, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number BUF061271. (KM)
August 31, 2018 Remark - Pro Se packet including Privacy Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge mailed to plaintiff. (KM)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., First Franklin Finance Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, filed by Michael Barlow. (Attachments: #1 exhibit 1, #2 exhibit 2, #3 exhibit 2b, #4 exhibit 3, #5 exhibit 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (KM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barlow v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Saydah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Franklin Finance Corporation
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Saydah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?