International Association of Bridge, Structural and Ornamental Ironworkers Local Union No. 6, et al v. Seneca Steel Erectors, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ironworkers Local No. 6 Apprentice Training Fund, Ironworkers and Employers Cooperative Trust Fund, Ironworkers Local No. 6 Profit Sharing Plan, Michael Kessler, Thomas J. Halligan, Ironworkers Local No. 6 Health and S.U.B. Fund, Chip Stevenson, International Association of Bridge, Structural and Ornamental Ironworkers Local Union No. 6, James J. Willis, III, James C. Logan, Jerome Halligan, Tom Saia, Brian Hart, Ironworkers Local No. 6 Pension Plan and Thomas Saia
Defendant: Seneca Steel Erectors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00995
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James C. Logan, Thomas J. Halligan, Chip Stevenson, Tom Saia, Brian Hart, Brian Hart(as Trustees of the Ironworkers and Employers Cooperative Trust Fund), Thomas Saia, Michael Kessler, Jerome Halligan, International Association of Bridge, Structural and Ornamental Ironworkers Local Union No. 6, James J. Willis, III. Seneca Steel Erectors, Inc. waiver sent on 9/20/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Boreanaz, Robert)
September 14, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Seneca Steel Erectors, Inc. (KM)
September 14, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
September 14, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
September 14, 2018 2 AMENDED EXHIBIT B by Jerome Halligan, Thomas J. Halligan, Brian Hart(as Trustees of the Ironworkers and Employers Cooperative Trust Fund), Brian Hart, International Association of Bridge, Structural and Ornamental Ironworkers Local Union No. 6, Michael Kessler, James C. Logan, Thomas Saia, Tom Saia, Chip Stevenson, James J. Willis, III. Amendment to #1 Complaint, Exhibt B Postioning Corrected. (Boreanaz, Robert) Modified title on 9/14/2018 (KM).
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Seneca Steel Erectors, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3217981, filed by Ironworkers Local No. 6 Health and S.U.B. Fund, Chip Stevenson, Brian Hart, Brian Hart(as Trustees of the ), International Association of Bridge, Structural and Ornamental Ironworkers Local Union No. 6, Ironworkers and Employers Cooperative Trust Fund, Thomas J. Halligan(and), Ironworkers Local No. 6 Apprentice Training Fund, James C. Logan, Thomas J. Halligan, Tom Saia, Ironworkers Local No. 6 Profit Sharing Plan, Thomas Saia, Michael Kessler, Jerome Halligan, Ironworkers Local No. 6 Pension Plan, James J. Willis, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Boreanaz, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Bridge, Structural and Ornamental Ironworkers Local Union No. 6, et al v. Seneca Steel Erectors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironworkers Local No. 6 Apprentice Training Fund
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironworkers and Employers Cooperative Trust Fund
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironworkers Local No. 6 Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kessler
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Halligan
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironworkers Local No. 6 Health and S.U.B. Fund
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chip Stevenson
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Bridge, Structural and Ornamental Ironworkers Local Union No. 6
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Willis, III
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Logan
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Halligan
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Saia
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hart
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironworkers Local No. 6 Pension Plan
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Saia
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seneca Steel Erectors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?