Juste v. Sessons, et al

Petitioner: Andre Juste
Respondent: Thomas Forley, Jeffrey Sessions, Warden of Immigration Detention Facility and Secretary Of The Department Of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv01015
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2018 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre Juste.(KM)
September 17, 2018 Pro Se Packet Mailed to Plaintiff which included: Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline. (SG)
September 14, 2018 11 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:18-cv-00922.
August 13, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER dismissing without prejudice #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying #6 Motion for Order to Show Cause; dismissing without prejudice #7 Motion to challenge custody. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 8/13/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lamc) [Transferred from pawd on 9/14/2018.]
August 13, 2018 9 Errata re #8 Order Reason for Correction: Correcting order to reflect that the outstanding motions are to be dismissed without prejudice. (lamc) [Transferred from pawd on 9/14/2018.]
August 13, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 8/13/2018. (lamc) [Transferred from pawd on 9/14/2018.]
August 9, 2018 7 MOTION to challenge custody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 by ANDRE JUSTE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv) [Transferred from pawd on 9/14/2018.]
August 7, 2018 6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by ANDRE JUSTE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd) [Transferred from pawd on 9/14/2018.]
July 30, 2018 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ANDRE JUSTE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (sdp) [Transferred from pawd on 9/14/2018.]
July 20, 2018 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ANDRE JUSTE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (sdp) [Transferred from pawd on 9/14/2018.]
July 19, 2018 3 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER directing petitioner to show cause why petition should not be transferred to USDC for the Western District of NY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 07/19/2018. (Mitchell, Robert) [Transferred from pawd on 9/14/2018.]
July 18, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is directed to file the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 07/18/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Mitchell, Robert) [Transferred from pawd on 9/14/2018.]
July 13, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANDRE JUSTE. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope) (sdp) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/16/2018) (sdp) [Transferred from pawd on 9/14/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juste v. Sessons, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andre Juste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Forley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Immigration Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Of The Department Of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?