A.M.H. v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Plaintiff: C. E., ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, A. M. H., INDIVIDUALLY AND IN HER CAPACITY AS LEGAL CUSTODIAN OF BABY C.E. and A.M.H.
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. n/k/a ACTAVIS, INC., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., Cephalon, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01018
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 22 TEXT ORDER re #20 Motion to Strike, #21 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Material. Responses are due on or before November 20, 2018. Replies are due on or before November 27, 2018. Upon receipt of all papers the Court will determine if oral argument is necessary and, if so, will inform the parties of the date and time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/30/2018.(CDH)
October 30, 2018 E-Filing Notification: Modified relief re #21 MOTION for Leave to File (SG)
October 29, 2018 21 MOTION for leave to file supplemental material in further support of #20 MOTION to Strike by A.M.H.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Creadore, Donald) Modified on 10/30/2018 (SG).
October 22, 2018 20 MOTION to Strike #17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to the extent that Endo seeks court relief in the form of a stay by A.M.H.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Memorandum in Support)(Creadore, Donald)
October 22, 2018 19 *Disregard - Document re-filed at #20 with all attachments* First MOTION to Strike #17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion seeking relief of stay by A.M.H..(Creadore, Donald) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KLH).
October 22, 2018 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by A.M.H.. (Creadore, Donald)
October 15, 2018 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rothman, Alan)
October 9, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: for Victor Cobb, Stephen Wussow and Celeste Brustowicz, $450.00, receipt number 61727 (SG)
October 9, 2018 16 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Victor Cobb; #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Wussow; #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Celeste Brustowicz. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/09/2018. (CDH). -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
October 3, 2018 Verified admissions to the Louisiana State Bar for Attorneys Victor Cobb, Stephen Wussow, and Celeste Brustowicz. (NRE)
October 1, 2018 15 MOTION for Celeste Brustowicz to appear pro hac vice by A.M.H.(SG)
October 1, 2018 14 MOTION for Stephen Wussow to appear pro hac vice by A.M.H.(SG)
October 1, 2018 13 MOTION for Victor Cobb to appear pro hac vice by A.M.H.(SG)
September 28, 2018 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc... (Rothman, Alan)
September 27, 2018 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.; Corporate Parent No Parent Corporation for Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc... (Cusker Gonzalez, Mara)
September 26, 2018 10 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The moving parties' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to the later of 30 days after (1) the Court's ruling on the pending motion to remand or (2) the entry of a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action (or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the multi-district litigation). SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/26/2018. (CDH)
September 25, 2018 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance Holdings LLC for AmerisourceBergen Corporation.. (Asfendis, Paul)
September 24, 2018 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Motion, Affirmation in Support and Memo of Law served on All defense counsel on 09/24/2018, filed by A.M.H.. (Creadore, Donald)
September 24, 2018 6 TEXT ORDER re #5 Motion to remand. Responses due on or before October 15, 2018. Replies due on or before October 22, 2018. Upon receipt of all papers the Court will determine if oral argument is necessary and, if so, will inform the parties of the date and time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/24/2018. (CDH)
September 24, 2018 5 MOTION to Remand by A.M.H.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support)(Creadore, Donald)
September 24, 2018 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
September 21, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 9/21/18. (SG)
September 21, 2018 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Manufacturer Defendants Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rothman, Alan)
September 21, 2018 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Letter Motion by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation.(Asfendis, Paul)
September 18, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
September 18, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
September 18, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
September 14, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc... (Rothman, Alan)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3220573) from Supreme Court of the State of New York, Niagara County, case number E165792/2018., filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rothman, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.M.H. v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. n/k/a ACTAVIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Alan Edward Rothman
Represented By: Sean Morris
Represented By: Angela R. Vicari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Alan Edward Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. E., ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M. H., INDIVIDUALLY AND IN HER CAPACITY AS LEGAL CUSTODIAN OF BABY C.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.H.
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper
Represented By: Victor Cobb
Represented By: David R. Barney
Represented By: Kevin W. Thompson
Represented By: Lawrence J. Centola
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Scott R. Bickford
Represented By: Donald E. Creadore
Represented By: Stephen H. Wussow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?