Hawkins v. GM Components Holdings LLC

Plaintiff: Adam Hawkins
Defendant: GM Components Holdings LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01058
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 7 DECLARATION signed by Katherine McClung re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GM Components Holdings LLC in Further Support filed by GM Components Holdings LLC. (McClung, Katherine)
October 11, 2018 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GM Components Holdings LLC. (McClung, Katherine)
October 9, 2018 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
October 5, 2018 5 MOTION SCHEDULING/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re #3 Motion to dismiss (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Responses due by 10/26/2018. Replies due by 11/2/2018.. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/5/18. (SG)
October 2, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GM Components Holdings LLC re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (McClung, Katherine)
October 2, 2018 3 MOTION to Dismiss by GM Components Holdings LLC. Responses due by 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Mike Moresco, #3 Exhibit 1 to Moresco Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Moresco Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Moresco Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Moresco Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Moresco Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Moresco Declaration)(McClung, Katherine)
October 1, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
October 1, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
October 1, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
September 26, 2018 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by GM Components Holdings LLC. to #1 Notice of Removal, Index to Record filed by GM Components Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service by UPS Overnight)(Rusnak, Theresa)
September 26, 2018 E-Filing Notification: re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL; Attorney is directed to file a certificate of service and Index to Record. Please use the Continuation of Exhibits event, found under Responses and Replies to file the documents. (SG)
September 25, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GM Components Holdings LLC from Lockport City Court Small Claim Part, case number SC-000124-18/LO. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3229933), filed by GM Components Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rusnak, Theresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. GM Components Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GM Components Holdings LLC
Represented By: Theresa Eileen Rusnak
Represented By: Katherine S. McClung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?