Battaglia v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Battaglia
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01104
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Quicken Loans, Inc. Responses due by 12/14/2018. Replies due by 12/21/2018. If necessary, the Court will schedule oral argument at later time. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/30/2018. (CMD)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Quicken Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hayden, Courtney)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Quicken Loans, Inc. The defendant's time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 11/29/2018. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/13/2018. (CMD)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quicken Loans, Inc.. (Hayden, Courtney)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Quicken Loans, Inc..(Hayden, Courtney)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Battaglia. Quicken Loans, Inc. served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Andrews, Seth)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Quicken Loans, Inc.. (SG)
October 11, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
October 11, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
October 11, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quicken Loans, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3243368, filed by David Battaglia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Andrews, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battaglia v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Battaglia
Represented By: Seth Andrews
Represented By: Kenneth R. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney L Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?