Juste v. Sessions et al

Petitioner: Andre Juste
Respondent: Thomas J Feeley, Jefferson B. Sessions, III and Jeffrey J. Searls
Case Number: 1:2018cv01110
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 10 CLERKS CERTIFICATE filed and electronically sent to Court of Appeals (Attachments: #1 Index)(KLH)
December 6, 2018 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Judgment by Andre Juste. FEE STATUS: Fee due, IFP denied. (KLH)
November 29, 2018 8 JUDGMENT that the petition is dismissed as duplicative and that leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals in forma pauperis is denied. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 11/29/2018. (KLH)
November 21, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER dismissing the petition as duplicative; leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals in forma pauperis is denied. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/21/2018. (KLH)
October 19, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre Juste.(KLH)
October 11, 2018 Remark: Petitioner has been mailed a pro se packet including Privacy Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KLH)
October 11, 2018 5 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-01918.
October 10, 2018 Case transferred to the USDC for the Western District of New York, pursuant to Court Order entered 09/17/2018. Sent to Court Electronically. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 10/11/2018.]
September 17, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Western District of New York. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 10/7/2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/13/2018. (zrdj) [Transferred from dcd on 10/11/2018.]
August 10, 2018 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ANDRE JUSTE (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 10/11/2018.]
August 10, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANDRE JUSTE (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 10/11/2018.]
August 10, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ANDRE JUSTE (Attachment: #1 Supplement) (zsb). [Transferred from dcd on 10/11/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/10/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 10/11/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juste v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andre Juste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas J Feeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson B. Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey J. Searls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?