Lutz et al v. Kaleida Health et al

Plaintiff: Kristin Schwartz, Linda Spring, Mary Ellen Lutz and Lea Shurmatz
Defendant: Kaleida Health, Susan Vallance and Kaleida Health Retirement Plan Committee
Case Number: 1:2018cv01112
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2018 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KLH)
November 29, 2018 11 TEXT ORDER re #10 Motion to Dismiss. Response papers are due on or before December 20, 2018. Reply papers are due on or before December 28, 2018. Upon receipt of all papers, the Court will determine if oral argument is necessary, and if so, inform the parties of the date and time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/29/2018. (KAC)
November 29, 2018 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Kaleida Health, Kaleida Health Retirement Plan Committee, Susan Vallance. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration of Susan Vallance in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to Vallance Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Vallance Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Vallance Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Vallance Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Vallance Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Vallance Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Vallance Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to Vallance Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to Vallance Declaration, #12 Exhibit J to Vallance Declaration, #13 Exhibit K to Vallance Declaration, #14 Exhibit L to Vallance Declaration, #15 Exhibit M to Vallance Declaration, #16 Exhibit N to Vallance Declaration, #17 Exhibit O to Vallance Declaration, #18 Exhibit P to Vallance Declaration, #19 Exhibit Q to Vallance Declaration)(Lane, Robert)
November 5, 2018 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kaleida Health, Kaleida Health Retirement Plan Committee, and Susan Vallance on October 30, 2018, filed by Mary Ellen Lutz, Kristin Schwartz, Lea Shurmatz, Linda Spring. (Gifford, Annette)
November 1, 2018 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaleida Health, Kaleida Health Retirement Plan Committee, Susan Vallance. (Lane, Robert)
November 1, 2018 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
October 30, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Annette M. Gifford on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gifford, Annette)
October 26, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER: Defendants' unopposed request for an extension to respond to plaintiffs' complaint through and including December 1, 2018 is SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/26/2018. (KLH)
October 26, 2018 E-Filing Notification regarding #4 Letter filed by Kaleida Health Retirement Plan Committee, Susan Vallance, Kaleida Health as to Kaleida Health Retirement Plan Committee, Susan Vallance, Kaleida Health: This document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. Clerk corrected entry. NO ACTION REQUIRED.(KLH)
October 25, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Lane, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Lane, Robert)
October 25, 2018 4 Letter Motion filed by Kaleida Health Retirement Plan Committee, Susan Vallance, Kaleida Health as to Kaleida Health Retirement Plan Committee, Susan Vallance, Kaleida Health Re Extension of Time to Respond. (Lane, Robert) Modified on 10/26/2018 (KLH).
October 12, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Kaleida Health, Kaleida Health Retirement Plan Committee, Susan Vallance. (KLH)
October 12, 2018 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Mary Ellen Lutz, Kristin Schwartz, Lea Shurmatz, Linda Spring. to #1 Complaint, Summonses filed by Mary Ellen Lutz, Kristin Schwartz, Lea Shurmatz, Linda Spring. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Lingle, Michael)
October 12, 2018 E-Filing Notification regarding #1 COMPLAINT: Summons forms attached in initial filing are corrupted and do not open properly. Filer is directed to re-file summons forms. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located in the Responses and Replies category. (KLH)
October 12, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
October 12, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
October 12, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Kaleida Health, Kaleida Health Retirement Plan Committee, Susan Vallance $ 400 receipt number 0209-3245228, filed by Linda Spring, Mary Ellen Lutz, Kristin Schwartz, Lea Shurmatz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lingle, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lutz et al v. Kaleida Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaleida Health
Represented By: Robert J. Lane, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Vallance
Represented By: Robert J. Lane, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaleida Health Retirement Plan Committee
Represented By: Robert J. Lane, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Schwartz
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Annette M. Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Spring
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Annette M. Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Lutz
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Annette M. Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Shurmatz
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Annette M. Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?