Allstate Insurance Company v. The United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: The New York Army National Guard, The United States of America and The Army National Guard
Case Number: 1:2018cv01117
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Cerrone on behalf of The Army National Guard, The New York Army National Guard, The United States of America (Cerrone, Michael)
October 31, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company re Automatic Referral to Mediation, Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge, #4 Summons Issued as to USA, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint, Exhibits A-B and Civil Cover Sheet (Wolf, Benjamin)
October 31, 2018 E-Filing Notification: Missing case caption and/or case number. Action required: re-file document in proper format re #5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company (Wolf, Benjamin) (SG)
October 30, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company re Automatic Referral to Mediation, Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge, #4 Summons Issued as to USA, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint, Exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet (Wolf, Benjamin)
October 24, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to The New York Army National Guard.(SG)
October 24, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to The Army National Guard, The United States of America and the U.S. Attorney(SG)
October 24, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
October 24, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
October 12, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company.. (Wolf, Benjamin)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Allstate a/s/o Pulaski against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3246526, filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form 95, #2 Exhibit Police Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to AG, #5 Summons to AAG, #6 Summons to Army National Guard, #7 Summons to NY Army National Guard)(Wolf, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York Army National Guard
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Army National Guard
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?