United States of America v. $11,294.00 United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $11,294.00 United States Currency
Claimant: John Petersen
Case Number: 1:2018cv01160
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIRMATION re #6 Claim filed by John Petersen -Certification of Service. (Fumerelle, Anthony)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony L. Fumerelle on behalf of John Petersen (Fumerelle, Anthony)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 CLAIM Forfeiture-Civil by John Petersen. (Fumerelle, Anthony)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date November 22, 2018. (Kane, Mary)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 WARRANT Returned executed as to $11,294.00 United States Currency. (KLH)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kane, Mary)
October 23, 2018 Arrest Warrant in Rem issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. Warrant Hearing set for 1/11/2019 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (KLH)
October 23, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
October 23, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C. Kane on behalf of United States of America (Kane, Mary)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $11,294.00 United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Arrest Warrant In Rem)(Kane, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $11,294.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $11,294.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John Petersen
Represented By: Anthony L. Fumerelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?