Broadcast Music Inc. et al v. Buffalo Wing Joint & Pub, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Still Working For The Man Music, Inc., Broadcast Music Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Tokeco Tunes, Groper Music, Turn Me On Music, Showbilly Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. and Rhythm Wrangler Music
Defendant: Buffalo Wing Joint & Pub, LLC and Candice Creamer
Case Number: 1:2018cv01257
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhythm Wrangler Music, Turn Me On Music, MJ Publishing Trust, Tokeco Tunes, Showbilly Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Broadcast Music Inc., Still Working For The Man Music, Inc., Groper Music. Candice Creamer served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Slifkin, Neal)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhythm Wrangler Music, Turn Me On Music, MJ Publishing Trust, Tokeco Tunes, Showbilly Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Broadcast Music Inc., Still Working For The Man Music, Inc., Groper Music. Buffalo Wing Joint & Pub, LLC served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Slifkin, Neal)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Buffalo Wing Joint & Pub, LLC, Candice Creamer. (Attachments: #1 summons issued)(SG)
November 13, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
November 13, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
November 13, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Inc., Groper Music, MJ Publishing Trust, Rhythm Wrangler Music, Showbilly Music, Still Working For The Man Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Turn Me On Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Slifkin, Neal)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buffalo Wing Joint & Pub, LLC, Candice Creamer $ 400 receipt number 0209-3273738, filed by Rhythm Wrangler Music, Turn Me On Music, MJ Publishing Trust, Tokeco Tunes, Showbilly Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Broadcast Music Inc., Still Working For The Man Music, Inc., Groper Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Proposed Summons to Buffalo Wing Joint & Pub, LLC, #4 Supplement Proposed Summons to Candice Creamer)(Slifkin, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc. et al v. Buffalo Wing Joint & Pub, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Still Working For The Man Music, Inc.
Represented By: Neal L. Slifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc.
Represented By: Neal L. Slifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJ Publishing Trust
Represented By: Neal L. Slifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokeco Tunes
Represented By: Neal L. Slifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Groper Music
Represented By: Neal L. Slifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turn Me On Music
Represented By: Neal L. Slifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Showbilly Music
Represented By: Neal L. Slifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Neal L. Slifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhythm Wrangler Music
Represented By: Neal L. Slifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Wing Joint & Pub, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Creamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?