Farhan v. Whitaker, et al
Defendant: Matthew G Whitaker, Acting Attorney General of the United States, L. Francis Cissna, Carmen M. Whaling and Kirstjen Nielsen
Petitioner: Aead Farhan
Respondent: Matthew Whitaker
Case Number: 1:2018cv01348
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Barrie Moar on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Carmen M. Whaling, Matthew Whitaker (Moar, Daniel)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aead Farhan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Service)(Kruger, Julie)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Carmen M. Whaling, Matthew Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 summons issued, #2 summons issued, #3 summons issued)(SG)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Aead Farhan. Whaling Summons filed by Aead Farhan. (Kruger, Julie)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Aead Farhan. Cissna Summons filed by Aead Farhan. (Kruger, Julie)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Aead Farhan. Nielsen Summons filed by Aead Farhan. (Kruger, Julie)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Aead Farhan. Whitaker Summons filed by Aead Farhan. (Kruger, Julie)
November 29, 2018 E-Filing Notification: re Complaint, attachment (2) Summons; Attorney is directed to use the Continuation of Exhibits event found under Responses and Replies to resubmit, an individual summons for each defendant.(SG)
November 29, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
November 29, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3287745, filed by Aead Farhan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kruger, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farhan v. Whitaker, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aead Farhan
Represented By: Julie E. Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G Whitaker, Acting Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen M. Whaling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Daniel Barrie Moar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?