Corp v. Saint-Gobain Advanced Ceramics, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Corp
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Advanced Ceramics, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01405
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah J McCarthy
Referring Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 04:00 PM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 1/23/19. (DAZ)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER - Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by United States District Judge William M. Skretny on 1/23/2019. (JCM)
January 22, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KM)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Saint-Gobain Advanced Ceramics, LLC.(Prestegaard, Linda)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER. The [9-1] Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer is HEREBY APPROVED. The Defendant's time to answer or otherwise make move with respect to the Complaint is extended to 1/18/2019. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 1/5/2018. (MEAL) Please note: Letters should NOT be e-filed or submitted to Judge Skretny.
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION by Saint-Gobain Advanced Ceramics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(Prestegaard, Linda)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Saint-Gobain Advanced Ceramics, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain for Saint-Gobain Advanced Ceramics, LLC.. (Prestegaard, Linda)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alissa M. Fortuna-Valentine on behalf of Saint-Gobain Advanced Ceramics, LLC (Fortuna-Valentine, Alissa)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda T. Prestegaard on behalf of Saint-Gobain Advanced Ceramics, LLC (Prestegaard, Linda)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Agent of Secretary of State, Amy Lesch on 12-11-2018, filed by Michael Corp. (Wicka, Kevin)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Saint-Gobain Advanced Ceramics, LLC. (KM) Modified on 12/10/2018 to add document to entry(KM).
December 7, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
December 7, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Michael Corp. Civil Cover Sheet (corrected - with counties) filed by Michael Corp. (Wicka, Kevin)
December 6, 2018 E-Filing Notification regarding (2) Civil Cover Sheet. Filer should refile the civil sheet and provide the county for each party. (KM)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Michael Corp. to #1 Complaint - Summons filed by Michael Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to complaint - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wicka, Kevin)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Saint-Gobain Advanced Ceramics, LLC $ 400 receipt number 0209-3295627, filed by Michael Corp.(Wicka, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corp v. Saint-Gobain Advanced Ceramics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Corp
Represented By: Kevin P. Wicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Advanced Ceramics, LLC
Represented By: Linda T. Prestegaard
Represented By: Alissa M. Fortuna-Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?