Erie Insurance Company v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Company
Defendant: Daniel D. Miller, Federal Bureau of Investigation and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv01422
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Erie Insurance Company. (Cercone, Marco)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erie Insurance Company. (Cercone, Marco)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erie Insurance Company. United States of America served on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Cercone, Marco)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney.(NRE)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (NRE)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Erie Insurance Company. to #3 Amended Complaint Summons for U.S. Attorney for the Western District of New York filed by Erie Insurance Company. (Cercone, Marco)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Erie Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B to Verified Amended Complaint, #2 Summons - United States of America)(Cercone, Marco)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, Daniel D. Miller. (KLH)
December 7, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint and Jury Demand against Federal Bureau of Investigation, Daniel D. Miller, as employee of the Federal Bureau of Investigation $ 400 receipt number 0209-3297284, filed by Erie Insurance Company a/s/o Gato Iyamuremye. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Daniel D. Miller, #2 Summons for Federal Bureau of Investigation, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cercone, Marco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erie Insurance Company v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Company
Represented By: Marco Cercone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?