Limousine Acquisition Company, LLC v. LX Limo LLC

Plaintiff: Limousine Acquisition Company, LLC d/b/a Buffalo Limousine and Limousine Acquisition Company, LLC
Defendant: LX Limo LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01440
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on LX Limo LLC on 01/03/2019, filed by Limousine Acquisition Company, LLC. (Reina, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Limousine Acquisition Company, LLC. (Reina, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Secretary of State on 12/21/18, filed by Limousine Acquisition Company, LLC. (Reina, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint)(KLH)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LX Limo LLC. (KLH)
December 10, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
December 10, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
December 10, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LX Limo LLC $ 400 receipt number 0209-3299435, filed by Limousine Acquisition Company, LLC d/b/a Buffalo Limousine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Reina, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Limousine Acquisition Company, LLC v. LX Limo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LX Limo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limousine Acquisition Company, LLC d/b/a Buffalo Limousine
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limousine Acquisition Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Reina
Represented By: Robert L. Boreanaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?