Privacy International et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al

Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union, Privacy International, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (ACLU), Civil Liberties and Transparency Clinic and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Defendant: Department of Justice Criminal Division, Internal Revenue Service, Treasury Inspector General for Tax Administration, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Secret Service, Department of Homeland Security Office of the Inspector General, Drug Enforcement Administration, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General, U.S. Customs and Border Protection and Department of the Treasury Office of the Inspector General
Case Number: 1:2018cv01488
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER. The #8 stipulation extending time to answer or appear is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The defendants' time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 3/4/2019. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 2/4/2019. (CMD)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #5 Amended Complaint,, (Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Appear) by Department of Homeland Security Office of the Inspector General, Department of Justice Criminal Division, Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General, Department of the Treasury Office of the Inspector General, Drug Enforcement Administration. (Cerrone, Michael)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Cerrone on behalf of All Defendants (Cerrone, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on All Defendant Agencies on January 18, 2019, filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Civil Liberties and Transparency Clinic, Privacy International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Manes, Jonathan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union, Civil Liberties and Transparency Clinic, Privacy International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB)(Manes, Jonathan)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Corporate Disclosure Statement served on All Defendant Agencies, the Attorney General of the United States, and the U.S. Attorney's Office for the WDNY on January 4, 2019, filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Civil Liberties and Transparency Clinic, Privacy International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Manes, Jonathan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security Office of the Inspector General, Department of Justice Criminal Division, Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General, Department of the Treasury Office of the Inspector General, Drug Enforcement Administration, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Internal Revenue Service, Treasury Inspector General for Tax Administration, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Secret Service, (Attachments: #1 summons issued, #2 summons issued, #3 summons issued, #4 summons issued, #5 summons issued, #6 summons issued, #7 summons issued, #8 summons issued, #9 summons issued, #10 summons issued)(SG)
December 26, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
December 26, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (ACLU), Civil Liberties and Transparency Clinic, Privacy International. (Manes, Jonathan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3313270, filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (ACLU), American Civil Liberties Union, Civil Liberties and Transparency Clinic, Privacy International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Civil Cover Sheet, #30 Summons (FBI), #31 Summons (DEA), #32 Summons (DOJ Criminal Division), #33 Summons (ICE), #34 Summons (CBP), #35 Summons (IRS), #36 Summons (Secret Service), #37 Summons (DOJ OIG), #38 Summons (DHS OIG), #39 Summons (Treasury OIG), #40 Summons (TIGTA))(Manes, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Privacy International et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice Criminal Division
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasury Inspector General for Tax Administration
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Secret Service
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security Office of the Inspector General
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury Office of the Inspector General
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Manes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Privacy International
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Manes
Represented By: Scarlet Kim
Represented By: Caroline Wilson Palow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (ACLU)
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Manes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Civil Liberties and Transparency Clinic
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Manes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Represented By: Jennifer Stisa Granick
Represented By: Brett Max Kaufman
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Manes
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?