Naillieux v. United States Mint (Money)
Plaintiff: Jason Wayne Naillieux
Defendant: United States Mint (Money)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00037
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason Wayne Naillieux (SG)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason Wayne Naillieux (SG)
January 9, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. ADR Notification mailed to Plaintiff.(SG)
January 7, 2019 Pro Se Packet handed to Plaintiff which included: Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline. (SG)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason Wayne Naillieux.(SG) Modified on 1/9/2019, Original document maintained in case file due to poor legibility. (SG).
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Mint (Money), filed by Jason Wayne Naillieux.(SG) Modified on 1/9/2019, Original document maintained in case file due to poor legibility. (SG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naillieux v. United States Mint (Money)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Mint (Money)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Wayne Naillieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?