New York Central Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.
Plaintiff: New York Central Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00063
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York Central Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Cercone, Marco)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New York Central Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Cercone, Marco)
January 23, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.. (SG)
January 14, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
January 14, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
January 14, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3331057, filed by New York Central Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Icon Health & Fitness, Inc., #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cercone, Marco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Central Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Central Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Marco Cercone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?