Loomis v. Anderson Precision, Inc.
Plaintiff: Debra A. Loomis
Defendant: Anderson Precision, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00085
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Anderson Precision, Inc..(Grasso, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anderson Precision, Inc.. (Grasso, James)
March 13, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Grasso on behalf of Anderson Precision, Inc. (Grasso, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Complaint by Anderson Precision, Inc.. (Grasso, James)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Anderson Precision, Inc. on 1/18/2019, filed by Debra A. Loomis. (Korn, Lindy)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Anderson Precision, Inc. (KM)
January 17, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
January 17, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anderson Precision, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3335903, filed by Debra A. Loomis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loomis v. Anderson Precision, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra A. Loomis
Represented By: Charles L. Miller, II
Represented By: Lindy Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Precision, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Grasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?