Klosin v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Plaintiff: Kristina R Klosin, as Administrator of the Estate of Christopher J. Klosin and Kristina R. Klosin
Defendant: E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00109
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael J Roemer
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Kristina R. Klosin re #8 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint of Non-Opposition (Wischerath, Melissa)
March 14, 2019 SCHEDULING NOTICE as to #8 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint. Responses due by 3/28/2019. Replies due by 4/4/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2019 10:30 AM before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ryan A. Lema, Esq., #2 Exhibit A to Lema Declaration (Proposed Third-Party Complaint), #3 Memorandum in Support)(Lema, Ryan)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.)Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2019 10:45 AM before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 3/5/2019. (RAZ)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 2/25/2019. (CMD)
February 11, 2019 Remark: All parties have submitted written waivers of judicial disqualification and this action shall continue to proceed before the Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (JMM)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Dorothy Wischerath on behalf of Kristina R. Klosin (Wischerath, Melissa)
January 28, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KLH)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company.(Lema, Ryan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company identifying Corporate Parent DowDuPont, Inc. for E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company.. (Lema, Ryan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa L. Smith on behalf of E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company (Smith, Lisa)
January 22, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
January 22, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
January 22, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company from Niagara County Supreme Court, case number E166836/2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3338969), filed by E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Index, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lema, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klosin v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina R Klosin, as Administrator of the Estate of Christopher J. Klosin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina R. Klosin
Represented By: James T. Scime
Represented By: Melissa Dorothy Wischerath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Ryan A. Lema
Represented By: Daniel Ryan Maguire
Represented By: Lisa L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?