Limousine Acquisition Company LLC v. LiveryLeads.com LLC et al

Plaintiff: Limousine Acquisition Company LLC, d/b/a Buffalo Limousine and Limousine Acquisition Company LLC
Defendant: PartyBusDetroit.com, LiveryLeads.com, LiveryLeads.com LLC and PartyBusDetroit.com LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00180
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION Motion for Alternate Service by Limousine Acquisition Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian D. Gwitt, Esq., #2 Exhibit A - Affidavits of Non-Service, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavits of Non-Service, #4 Exhibit C - Minute Orders, #5 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Alternate Service)(Gwitt, Brian)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Affidavit of Non-Service upon Partybusdetroit.com, filed by Limousine Acquisition Company LLC. (Gwitt, Brian)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Affidavit of Non-Service upon Partybusdetroit.com, filed by Limousine Acquisition Company LLC. (Gwitt, Brian)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Affidavit of Non-Service upon Liveryleads.com, filed by Limousine Acquisition Company LLC. (Gwitt, Brian)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Affidavit of Non-Service upon Liveryleads.com, filed by Limousine Acquisition Company LLC. (Gwitt, Brian)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service Non-Service on PartyBusDetroit.com, filed by Limousine Acquisition Company LLC. (Gwitt, Brian)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service Non-Service on Liveryleads.com, filed by Limousine Acquisition Company LLC. (Gwitt, Brian)
February 21, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint)(KLH)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LiveryLeads.com LLC, PartyBusDetroit.com LLC. (KLH)
February 11, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
February 11, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
February 11, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LiveryLeads.com, PartyBusDetroit.com $ 400 receipt number 0209-3357901, filed by Limousine Acquisition Company LLC, d/b/a Buffalo Limousine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Website excerpts, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Summons - LiveryLeads.com, #5 Summons - PartyBusDetroit.com)(Gwitt, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Limousine Acquisition Company LLC v. LiveryLeads.com LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limousine Acquisition Company LLC, d/b/a Buffalo Limousine
Represented By: Brian D. Gwitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limousine Acquisition Company LLC
Represented By: Brian D. Gwitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PartyBusDetroit.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LiveryLeads.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LiveryLeads.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PartyBusDetroit.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?