Ebling v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nancy Ebling
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00203
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah J McCarthy
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Freedenberg, John)
March 25, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 04:00 PM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 3/18/19. (DAZ)
March 18, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KLH)
March 16, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 3/16/2019. (CMD)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Freedenberg, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (NRE)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to E-Filing Notification Proposed Summons. (Green, Justin)
February 15, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Attorney shall resubmit Summons with correct case number re #2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint [Proposed Summons]. (Green, Justin) (SG)
February 15, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
February 15, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
February 15, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint [Proposed Summons]. (Green, Justin)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delta Air Lines, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3363058, filed by Nancy Ebling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Green, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebling v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Ebling
Represented By: Justin T. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Freedenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?