Belsito v. County of Erie, et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas H. Belsito
Defendant: Kenneth P. Achtyl, Sheriff Timothy B. Howard, James W. Flowers and County of Erie
Case Number: 1:2019cv00215
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Hugh B Scott
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nicholas H. Belsito filed by Nicholas H. Belsito. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Memorandum in Support, #5 Certificate of Service)(Glazer, Aaron)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIRMATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kenneth P. Achtyl, Timothy B. Howard, County of Erie, James W. Flowers filed by Kenneth P. Achtyl, Timothy B. Howard, County of Erie, James W. Flowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Order)(D'Aquino, Albert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER re #5 Motion to Dismiss. Responses are due on or before 4/15/2019. Replies are due on or before 4/22/2019. Upon receipt of all papers, the Court will determine if oral argument is necessary and, if so, will advise the parties of the date and time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/26/2019. (KAC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Kenneth P. Achtyl, County of Erie, James W. Flowers, Timothy B. Howard. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Certificate of Service)(D'Aquino, Albert)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Hugh B. Scott for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 2/28/2019. (KM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Kenneth P. Achtyl, County of Erie, James W. Flowers, Timothy B. Howard.(D'Aquino, Albert)
February 21, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
February 21, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
February 21, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Kenneth P. Achtyl, County of Erie, James W. Flowers, Timothy B. Howard. Index of Documents filed by Kenneth P. Achtyl, County of Erie, James W. Flowers, Timothy B. Howard. (D'Aquino, Albert) Modified on 2/21/2019 (KM).
February 20, 2019 E-Filing Notification regarding #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Filer required to file an index of of documents filed pursuant to Local Rule 81(3) found on our website at www.nywd.uscourts.gov. (KM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from New York State Supreme Court, County of Erie, case number 801623/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3365379), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(D'Aquino, Albert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belsito v. County of Erie, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth P. Achtyl
Represented By: Albert J. D'Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Timothy B. Howard
Represented By: Albert J. D'Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Flowers
Represented By: Albert J. D'Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Erie
Represented By: Albert J. D'Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas H. Belsito
Represented By: Aaron F. Glazer
Represented By: Alex Smith
Represented By: Kevin Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?