Castro et al v. Colgate-Palmolive Company et al

Plaintiff: John Castro and Joyce Castro
Defendant: Rio Tinto America, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Giant, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Health and Wellness Solutions, Inc., Revlon Holdings, Inc., Rio Tinto Ltd., Rio Tinto Minerals Inc. and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00279
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Hugh B Scott
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Second Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murdica, James)
April 29, 2019 Filing 33 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Revlon Holdings, Inc.. to #31 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Manuel A. Guevara, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3433309.) Corrected Attorney Application filed by Revlon Holdings, Inc.. (Debrowski, Mark)
April 29, 2019 E-Filing Notification: #32 **DISREGARD - filed on wrong case* CLERKS CERTIFICATE filed and electronically sent to Court of Appeals (Attachments: # 1 Index)(KLH) (KLH)
April 29, 2019 Filing 32 **DISREGARD - filed on wrong case* CLERKS CERTIFICATE filed and electronically sent to Court of Appeals (Attachments: #1 Index)(KLH) Modified on 4/29/2019 (KLH).
April 29, 2019 E-Filing Notification regarding #31 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Manuel A. Guevara, Esq.: Attorney Petition filed as attachment #5 is incomplete. Petitioner is directed to complete #3(c) and re-file this document only, utilizing the Continuation of Exhibits event, located in the Responses and Replies category. (KLH)
April 26, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Manuel A. Guevara, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3433309.) by Revlon Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of M. Debrowski, Esq. in Support, #2 Certification of M. Guevara, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit M. Debrowski Sponsoring Affidavit, #5 M. Guevara Attorney Application, #6 Civility Principles and Guidelines, #7 M. Guevara Attorney's Oath, #8 Attorney Database Information Sheet, #9 ECF Registration Form)(Debrowski, Mark)
April 24, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION that this Court defer ruling on Plaintiff's pending remand motion #15 until the District of Delaware has ruled on the J&J Defendants' Venue Motion filed by John Castro, Joyce Castro. (Dymond, Seth)
April 19, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION that this Court defer ruling on Plaintiff's pending remand motion #15 until the District of Delaware has ruled on the J&J Defendants' Venue Motion by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (1 of 3) J&J Defendants' Venue Motion, #2 Exhibit A (2 of 3) J&J Defendants' Venue Motion, #3 Exhibit A (3 of 3) J&J Defendants' Venue Motion)(Kurland, Thomas)
April 18, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by John Castro, Joyce Castro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dymond, Seth)
April 18, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth A. Dymond on behalf of John Castro, Joyce Castro (Dymond, Seth)
April 12, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health and Wellness Solutions, Inc., Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas P. Kurland, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit 2, Confirmation Notice, #4 Exhibit 3, Notice of Deposition of John Castro, #5 Exhibit 4, March 15, 2019 email)(Kurland, Thomas)
April 8, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION OF ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Kozak, Christopher)
April 5, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Kozak on behalf of Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Kozak, Christopher)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The #22 Stipulation of Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company is SO ORDERED. Answer due date updated as to Cyprus Amax Minerals Company answer due 5/3/2019. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 4/4/2019. (KLH)
April 3, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (L'Homme, Michael)
April 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert L'Homme on behalf of Cyprus Amax Minerals Company (L'Homme, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER regarding #18 Stipulation filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/29/2019. (KLH)
March 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Debrowski on behalf of Revlon Holdings, Inc. (Debrowski, Mark)
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murdica, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER RE: #12 Order.The April 15, 2019 deadline is suspended pending resolution of the motion to remand (Dkt. No. 15).SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 3/25/2019. (GAI)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Responses shall be filed by April 12, 2019. Replies shall be filed by April 19, 2019. Upon receipt of all papers the Court will determine if oral argument is necessary and, if so, shall inform the parties of the date and time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 03/22/2019. (CDH)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by John Castro, Joyce Castro. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand to State Court, #2 Declaration of James C. Long, Jr. in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - 8th Judicial District Asbestos CMO, #5 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service on Colgate-Palmolive, #6 Exhibit D - Affidavits of Service on Revlon, #7 Exhibit E - Affidavits of Service on J&J, #8 Certificate of Service)(Long, James)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Long, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Long, James)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Murdica on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Murdica, James)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 DECISION AND ORDER soliciting briefing RE: Venue.Responses due by 4/15/2019.Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 3/21/2019. (GAI)
March 20, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KLH)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colgate-Palmolive Company. (DiMarco, Erik)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Colgate-Palmolive Company.(DiMarco, Erik)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hugh B. Scott for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/8/2019. (KLH)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health and Wellness Solutions, Inc., Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Kurland, Thomas)
March 4, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
March 4, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
March 4, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Johnson & Johnson Health and Wellness Solutions, Inc.. (Kurland, Thomas)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Kurland, Thomas)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Johnson & Johnson. (Kurland, Thomas)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson Health and Wellness Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Health and Wellness Solutions, Inc... (Kurland, Thomas)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc... (Kurland, Thomas)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corporation for Johnson & Johnson.. (Kurland, Thomas)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Health and Wellness Solutions, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Erie, case number 802577/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3376664), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Health and Wellness Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, copy of all filings in the state court action, #3 Exhibit B, Index of state court filings)(Kurland, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro et al v. Colgate-Palmolive Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Castro
Represented By: James C. Long, Jr.
Represented By: Seth A. Dymond
Represented By: Joseph W. Belluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Castro
Represented By: James C. Long, Jr.
Represented By: Seth A. Dymond
Represented By: Joseph W. Belluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Tinto America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Michael Robert L'Homme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Represented By: John D. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Represented By: John D. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Erik C. DiMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Health and Wellness Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Represented By: John D. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Debrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Tinto Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Tinto Minerals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?