Shi v. Moog, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Charles Shi
Defendant: Moog Inc. and Moog Control System (Shanghai) Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00339
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
March 21, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00026.
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to transfer case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York, terminate all pending motions, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/12/2019. (laf) [Transferred from flmd on 3/21/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to transfer case -venue to U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York by Charles Shi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stallings, Stephen) [Transferred from flmd on 3/21/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charles Shi with Jury Demand. filed by Charles Shi.(Stallings, Stephen) [Transferred from flmd on 3/21/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Unassigned Magistrate Judge. New case number: 2:19-cv-26-FtM-38UAM. Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando no longer assigned to the case. (LMF) [Transferred from flmd on 3/21/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement re #5 Interested Persons Order by Charles Shi. (Stallings, Stephen) Modified on 1/29/2019 as to docket text (MLS). [Transferred from flmd on 3/21/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Charles Shi. Related case(s): no (Stallings, Stephen) [Transferred from flmd on 3/21/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/29/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/15/2019. (WRW) [Transferred from flmd on 3/21/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/29/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/15/2019. (WRW) [Transferred from flmd on 3/21/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/14/2019. (MLS) [Transferred from flmd on 3/21/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Moog Control System (Shanghai) Co. Ltd., Moog, Inc. (JCG) [Transferred from flmd on 3/21/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Moog Control System (Shanghai) Co. Ltd., Moog, Inc. with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA054852 filed by Charles Shi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCG) [Transferred from flmd on 3/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shi v. Moog, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moog Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moog Control System (Shanghai) Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Shi
Represented By: Stephen Sean Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?