Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Protocol of Amherst, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Protocol of Amherst, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00598
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Protocol of Amherst, Inc.. (Friedman, Jennifer)
June 20, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Protocol of Amherst, Inc. waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Fox-Solomon, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda H. Joseph on behalf of Protocol of Amherst, Inc. (Joseph, Linda)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Friedman on behalf of Protocol of Amherst, Inc. (Friedman, Jennifer)
May 10, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
May 10, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
May 10, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Protocol of Amherst, Inc., filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fox-Solomon, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Protocol of Amherst, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protocol of Amherst, Inc.
Represented By: Linda H. Joseph
Represented By: Jennifer L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Fox-Solomon
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Burstein
Represented By: Nora E. Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?