White v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Mr. Joseph A. White and Joseph A. White
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00599
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KLH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant United States of America by United States of America.(Smith, Kathryn)
May 29, 2019 E-Filing Notification regarding #4 NOTICE of Appearance: Please disregard. Corrected document has been re-filed at dkt. #5. (KLH)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Brady on behalf of Joseph A. White (Brady, Daniel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 *Disregard - corrected document filed at #5* NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Brady on behalf of Joseph A. White (Brady, Daniel) Modified on 5/29/2019 (KLH).
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (KLH)
May 10, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
May 10, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
May 10, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph A. White (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hagerty, Thomas)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America $ 400 receipt number 0209-3445968, filed by Joseph A. White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Merit)(Hagerty, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Joseph A. White
Represented By: Thomas V. Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. White
Represented By: Thomas V. Hagerty
Represented By: Daniel J. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Kathryn L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?